IL SB0139 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Limits the situations when a person could dock an animal's tail or crop its ears without violating the Act's prohibition against "animal torture". Establishes that the following is not "animal torture": (i) tail docking performed by an Illinois licensed veterinarian for a medical reason (now, just "tail docking") or (ii) ear cropping performed by an Illinois licensed veterinarian for a medical reason (now, just "ear cropping"). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMANE CARE FOR ANIMALS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-15 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
2009-08-15 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2009-04-03 Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009
2009-03-31 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Held in Agriculture and Conservation
2009-03-30 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
2009-03-25 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-25 Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2009-03-11 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009
2009-03-11 Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 006-004-000
2009-03-10 Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2009-03-10 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2009-03-10 Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
2009-03-10 Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-10 Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2009-03-05 Held in Agriculture and Conservation
2009-02-25 Held in Agriculture and Conservation
2009-02-19 Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation
2009-02-19 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation
2009-02-18 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
2009-02-17 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2009-02-17 Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2009-02-04 Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
2009-01-30 Referred to Assignments
2009-01-30 First Reading
2009-01-30 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback