IL SB1388 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the placement of temporary stop signs on State and local highways as a substitute for a missing or damaged permanent stop sign. Requires that every temporary stop sign shall conform to the requirements in the State Manual and Specifications. Requires that every temporary stop sign placed on a highway shall be a minimum of 6 feet in height, and shall be in place for no more 2 weeks, except in cases of emergency.
Title
VEH CD-TEMPORARY STOP SIGNS
Sponsors
Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Christine Radogno [R] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0124 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 016-000-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-27 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-04-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |