IL SB1387 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearms Concealed Carry Act. Provides that for a new or renewal concealed carry license, the fee shall be $100 (rather than $150), of which $80 (rather than $120) shall be apportioned to the State Police Firearm Services Fund, $15 (rather than $20) shall be apportioned to the Mental Health Reporting Fund, and $5 (rather than $10) shall be apportioned to the State Crime Laboratory Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY LICENSE FEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306660Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback