IL SB1386 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Provider Funding Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Extends the period of time certain hospital assessments are imposed through State fiscal year 2020. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
MEDICAID-HOSPITAL ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 14-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5e.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |