IL SB1381 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes language allowing the Department of Transportation to designate streets or highways in the system of State highways as Class III highways and makes changes governing the designation of Class II highways. Deletes language regarding: the maximum length of vehicles on all non-State highways; and the highways that vehicles not exceeding 65 feet in overall length are allowed to access. Provides that combinations of vehicles over 65 feet in length with no overall length limitation are allowed certain access if there is no sign prohibiting access and the route is not being used as a thoroughfare between Class I or Class II highways. Provides that the maximum length limitation on non-designated highways for a truck tractor in combination with a semitrailer is 65 feet overall dimension and 60 feet overall dimension for a truck tractor-semitrailer-trailer or truck tractor semitrailer-semitrailer. Provides that length limitations do not apply on legal holidays and for a tow truck in combination with a disabled vehicle or combination of disabled vehicles. Provides that a unit of local government shall affirm to the Department if it has no Class II designated truck routes. Provides that units of local government may report to the Department, and the Department shall post on its website, any limitations prohibiting the operation of vehicles imposed by ordinance or resolution in the unit of local government's non-designated highway system. Provides that, to be effective, an ordinance or resolution designating a Class II roadway need not require that signs be erected, but the designation shall be reported to the Department. Repeals a provision that requires local units of government to report to the Department all preferred truck routes, designated truck route networks, or whether there are no such truck routes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-HIGHWAY DESIGNATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-03-07HouseArrived in House
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateDo Pass Transportation; 020-000-000
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62551-126.1Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-214Repealed CodeCitation Text
625515-107Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-116Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-316Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback