IL SB1381 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Hearing: Jun 27 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Adds provisions to the Telecommunications Article concerning the transition of Large Electing Providers to Internet Protocol-based networks and service. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017, a Large Electing Provider may cease to offer and provide a telecommunications service to an identifiable class or group of customers, other than voice telecommunications service to residential customers, upon 60 days' notice to the Commission and affected customers. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017, a Large Electing Provider, may cease to offer and provide voice telecommunications service to an identifiable class or group of residential customers subject to compliance with specified requirements. Repeals language that provides for the repeal of the Telecommunications Article of the Public Utilities Act on July 1, 2017. Removes the December 31, 2020 expiration date for an Illinois Commerce Commission-issued authorization to offer or provide cable or video service. Repeals language that provides for the repeal of specified Sections of the Cable and Video Competition Article of the Illinois Public Utilities Act on July 1, 2017. Defines terms and makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TELECOMS-IP-BASED SERVICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Public Utilities Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-25HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2017-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-24HouseArrived in House
2017-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-002-000
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
2017-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Telecommunications and Information Technology; 018-000-000
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2017
2017-05-22SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 015-000-000
2017-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-17SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-17SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-02-17SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220513-102Amended CodeCitation Text
220513-103Amended CodeCitation Text
220513-1200Repealed CodeCitation Text
220513-406Amended CodeCitation Text
220513-406.1New CodeSee Bill Text
220521-1601Repealed CodeCitation Text
220521-401Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback