IL SB1379 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children's Health Insurance Program Act. In a provision concerning care coordination, provides that mandatory assignments into managed care organizations must not occur when 50% of persons eligible for selecting a managed care service are covered through an integrated care program until the Department of Healthcare and Family Services demonstrates that the net per-recipient cost paid by non-federal, State revenue sources in those contracts, adjusted for age and gender, is less than the non-federal, net State per-recipient cost in fee-for-service for fiscal year 2014 and the health outcome goals required in contracts have been achieved. Requires that all per-recipient cost calculations be performed between like eligibility categories. Excludes Hospital Assessment Program payments from these calculations. Requires the Department to annually calculate and publish on its website a report on the per-recipient cost calculations and certain other information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD INS-MANAGED CARE ORGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21510623Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback