IL SB1377 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that the Director of Insurance shall approve a plan of division unless he or she finds that each new company created by the proposed division, except a new company that is a nonsurviving party to certain mergers, that will be a member insurer of the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and that will have policy liabilities allocated to it will not be licensed to do insurance business in each state where such policies were written by the dividing company.
Title
IL INSURANCE GUARANTY FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0549 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-001 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-14 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 020-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 534.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 537.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 537.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |