IL SB1373 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Illinois Department of Transportation (currently, the Regional Transportation Authority) shall develop, adopt, and implement system safety program standards and procedures meeting the requirements of the federal Fixing America's Surface Transportation Act. Limits liability. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to make certain records of the Illinois Department of Transportation exempt from inspection and copying. Amends the Bi-State Transit Safety Act. Provides a repeal date of December 31, 2017 for that Act. Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the Regional Transportation Authority shall comply with all safety requirements under specified federal law as required by the Department of Transportation. Provides that the Department of Transportation has rail transit safety oversight authority for MetroLink. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RTA-IDOT-FAST ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christine Winger
2017-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-300Amended CodeCitation Text
2027052705-615New CodeSee Bill Text
20270549.18Amended CodeCitation Text
45111100New CodeSee Bill Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
7036059bAmended CodeCitation Text
7036152.11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback