IL SB1373 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Illinois Department of Transportation (currently, the Regional Transportation Authority) shall develop, adopt, and implement system safety program standards and procedures meeting the requirements of the federal Fixing America's Surface Transportation Act. Limits liability. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to make certain records of the Illinois Department of Transportation exempt from inspection and copying. Amends the Bi-State Transit Safety Act. Provides a repeal date of December 31, 2017 for that Act. Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the Regional Transportation Authority shall comply with all safety requirements under specified federal law as required by the Department of Transportation. Provides that the Department of Transportation has rail transit safety oversight authority for MetroLink. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RTA-IDOT-FAST ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2705 | 2705-615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2705 | 49.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 111 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3605 | 9b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |