IL SB1372 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mercury Switch Removal Act. Changes the Act's repeal date from January 1, 2027 to January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MERCURY SWITCH REMOVAL ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0092
2017-08-11SenateEffective Date August 11, 2017
2017-08-11SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-13SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-15SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017
2017-03-02SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4159755Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback