IL SB1371 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Changes the definition of "door security locking means" to mean a door locking means intended for use by a trained school district employee in a school building for the purpose of preventing ingress (rather than both ingress and egress) through a door of the building. Adds to the requirements a school district must meet to install a door security locking means. Provides that a school district may install a door security locking means that does not comply with all applicable State and federal accessibility requirements or that is more than 48 inches above the finished floor if (i) the school district meets all other requirements for installing a door security locking means and (ii) prior to its installation, local law enforcement officials, the local fire department, and the school board agree, in writing, to the installation and use of the door security locking means. Provides that the school district must keep the agreement on file, must, upon request, provide the agreement to its regional office of education, and must include the agreement in its filed school safety plan under the School Safety Drill Act. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
SCH CD-TEMP DOOR LOCK DEVICE
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0548 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |