IL SB1364 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Meat and Poultry Inspection Act. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2018, licenses issued to Type I and Type II establishments (meat and poultry processing and slaughtering) shall not expire if the licensee remains in compliance with the provisions of the Act. Provides that if the management at a Type I establishment desires to work under conditions which will require the services of a Department of Agriculture inspector on any Saturday, Sunday, or holiday, or for more than an approved work day on any other day shall request the Department representative (currently, Regional Administrator) to furnish inspection service during those times. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEAT AND POULTRY INSPECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-000
2018-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-000
2018-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-11-27HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-11-27HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Agriculture & Conservation Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2018-11-27HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-11-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-11-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-11-14HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles Meier
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017
2017-03-02SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22565011Amended CodeCitation Text
2256503Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback