IL SB1361 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that, with respect to any benefit year beginning on or after January 1, 2018, to be monetarily eligible for any benefits, a worker must have been paid wages of $4,290 or more in his or her base period by employers subject to the Unemployment Insurance Act and at least $2,145 of these wages must have been paid to him or her outside the calendar quarter in which he or she was paid the highest amount of wages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNEMPLOY INS-MINIMUM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LB)
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
820405500Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback