IL SB1358 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that an employee who is required to travel in connection with his or her employment and who suffers an injury while in travel status is eligible for benefits only if the injury arises out of and in the course of employment while he or she is actively engaged in the duties of employment. Adds definitions of "accident" and "injury". Provides that an injury is a condition that arises out of and in the course of employment, and adds provisions concerning establishment of an injury. Establishes the manner of computing compensation for partial disability, with a maximum cumulative compensation of 500 weeks. Provides that injuries to the shoulder and hip are deemed to be injuries to the arm and leg respectively. Provides for the computation of compensation when there are multiple employers and when there is less than full-time work. Provides that no employer shall be required to pay temporary partial disability benefits to an employee who has been discharged for cause. Provides that, following a hearing, the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission may reinstate the temporary partial benefits and retroactively restore any benefits the employer should have paid if it finds the employer's discharge of the employee was not for cause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORK COMP-CAUSATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Tort Reform
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203051Amended CodeCitation Text
82030510Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback