IL SB1356 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that a municipality or a county, with respect to unincorporated portions of the county, may impose specified separate requirements on video gaming that impose limitations on video gaming more restrictive than those provided under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIDEO GAMING-LOCAL RESTRICTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Gaming
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Gaming
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Gaming
2018-01-30SenateRe-assigned to Gaming
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Gaming
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2304027Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback