IL SB1356 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that a municipality or a county, with respect to unincorporated portions of the county, may impose specified separate requirements on video gaming that impose limitations on video gaming more restrictive than those provided under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-LOCAL RESTRICTION
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Gaming |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Gaming |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Gaming |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Gaming |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Gaming |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1356&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1356.htm |