IL SB1353 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for a person who is a resident in a facility licensed under the ID/DD Community Care Act, the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act, or the MC/DD Act for whom payments are made throughout a month and who is determined to be eligible for medical assistance, the State shall pay an amount in addition to the minimum monthly personal needs allowance authorized under the Social Security Act so that the person's total monthly personal needs allowance from both State and federal sources equals $60. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 009-006-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-018-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-003-000
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-35New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback