IL SB1352 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the engrossed bill but specifies that the amendatory provisions apply to the termination of service by a teacher (instead of the termination of contractual continued service by a teacher).
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER RESIGNATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0549 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date August 11, 2023 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-001-000 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2023-05-18 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-18 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 18, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-013-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000 |
2023-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; by Voice Vote |
2023-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-002-000 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-003-000 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |