IL SB1350 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021
2021-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Ethics
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2021-05-13SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran
2021-05-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2021-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54301-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback