IL SB1350 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Acupuncture Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Acupuncture Practice Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Acupuncture and East Asian Medicine Practice Act. Allows for the practice of East Asian medicine. Makes changes to the definition of "acupuncture" and "acupuncturist". Defines "East Asian medicine". Removes the definition of "referral by written orders". Removes language allowing a physician or a dentist to refer by written order a patient to an acupuncturist and maintain management of the patient. Adds provisions concerning guest practitioners of acupuncture and East Asian medicine. Changes the name of the Board of Acupuncture to the Board of Acupuncture and East Asian Medicine and allows licensed practitioners of East Asian medicine to be members of the Board. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall issue a license to an applicant that submits proof of a demonstration of status as a Diplomate of Acupuncture or Diplomate of Oriental Medicine with the National Certification Commission for Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine or an equivalent credential approved by the Department (rather than passing the National Certification Commission for Acupuncture and Oriental Medicine examination or an equivalent examination). Makes changes in provisions concerning titles and designations that can be used by those licensed under the Act. Makes conforming changes in the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Act, the Tattoo and Body Piercing Establishment Registration Act, and the Professional Service Corporation Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACUPUNCTURE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22521Amended CodeCitation Text
225210Amended CodeCitation Text
2252110Amended CodeCitation Text
225215Amended CodeCitation Text
225220.1Amended CodeCitation Text
225220.2New CodeSee Bill Text
225235Amended CodeCitation Text
225240Amended CodeCitation Text
22525Amended CodeCitation Text
225250Amended CodeCitation Text
225255Amended CodeCitation Text
4105410Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text
805103.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback