IL SB1348 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 from December 31, 2017 to December 31, 2027. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of any change of address or email address through specified means. Defines "email address of record". In provisions concerning grounds for discipline, provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may take action with regard to a person licensed under the Act for: willfully failing to report an instance of suspected abuse, neglect, financial exploitation, or self-neglect of an eligible adult as defined in and required by the Adult Protective Services Act; and being named as an abuser in a verified report by the Department on Aging under the Adult Protective Services Act, and upon proof by clear and convincing evidence that the licensee abused, neglected, or financially exploited an eligible adult as defined in the Adult Protective Services Act. In provisions authorizing the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation to appoint a hearing officer, provides that the hearing officer's findings and recommendations shall also be provided to the Medical Licensing Board along with the Medical Disciplinary Board so both Boards may review the information and present their findings to the Secretary. Makes changes in provisions concerning stenographers. Changes references to "stenographer" to references to "certified shorthand reporter". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAL PRACTICE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0429 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 60 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.27a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.37a | New Code | See Bill Text |