IL SB1347 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Living Wage Act. Provides that the State, its agencies, and political subdivisions shall ensure that new contracts and subcontracts include a provision specifying that, as a condition of payment of the contract, the minimum wage to be paid to workers in performance of the contract or subcontract shall be at least $16.36 per hour for new contracts created after January 1, 2018. Provides that for every year thereafter, the Department of Labor shall adjust the amount of the hourly minimum wage by the annual percentage increase in the consumer price index. Sets forth provisions concerning enforcement and penalties. Creates a private right of action to enforce the provisions of the Act. Provides for debarment of certain contractors or subcontractors for violation of the Act. Contains severability provisions. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIVING WAGE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Biss
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 010-005-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 010-006-000
2017-04-05SenateFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-28SenateFiscal Note Requested by Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-003-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback