IL SB1346 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. With respect to the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption, provides that, beginning in assessment year 2019, the taxpayer's household income shall be reduced by any amounts paid as Medicare premiums. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TAX-SR FREEZE-MEDICARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-10HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Ellman
2019-04-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 006-000-000
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-21SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback