IL SB1345 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Specifies that certain excess municipal contributions may be used only for reducing the amount that the city would otherwise be required to contribute for duty disability, occupational disease, or the administrative costs of the fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-CHGO FIRE-CONTRIBUTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-08SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0563
2017-12-08SenateGovernor Approved
2017-11-09SenateSent to the Governor
2017-11-09SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-11-09SenateSenate Concurs
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 043-005-000
2017-11-09Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-07SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-11-07SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-11-07SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-11-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 7, 2017
2017-11-01SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-10-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2017-10-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-10-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-10-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-07-06HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-001
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4056-161Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1345&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1345.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1345eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1345enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0563.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1345ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1345ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1345_04262017_040000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1345_10252017_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1345ham002_11092017_011000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback