IL SB1343 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that "extreme heavy duty tow and recovery vehicle" means a tow truck manufactured as a unit having a lifting capacity of not less than 50 tons, and having either 4 axles and an unladen weight of not more than 80,000 pounds or 5 axles and an unladen weight not more than 90,000 pounds. Provides that, notwithstanding otherwise applicable gross and axle weight limits, an extreme heavy duty tow and recovery vehicle may lawfully travel to and from the scene of a disablement and clear a disabled vehicle if the towing service has obtained an extreme heavy duty tow and recovery permit for the vehicle. Provides that the form and content of the permit shall be determined by the Department of Transportation with respect to highways under its jurisdiction and by local authorities with respect to highways under their jurisdiction. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
VEH CD-HEAVY DUTY TOW VEHICLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0547 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |