IL SB1343 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0091
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0091
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that the Division of Probation Services shall establish training standards for continuing education of probation officers and supervisors and broaden access to available training programs. Effective immediately.
Title
PROBATION OFFICER-TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0091 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 110 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |