IL SB1342 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Endangered Species Protection Act. Provides a person shall not allow for the participation of an African elephant or Asian elephant protected under the federal Endangered Species Act of 1973 in a traveling animal act. Provides that the provision does not apply to an exhibition of elephants at a non-mobile, permanent institution, or facility. Provides that a person who violates the Section is subject to a civil penalty of not less than $500 or more than $10,000 for each violation. Defines "mobile or traveling housing facility", "performance", and "traveling animal act". Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEPHANT PROHIB-TRAV PERFORM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-15SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-15HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 091-014-000
2017-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-15HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2017-03-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017
2017-03-02SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
520102Amended CodeCitation Text
520103.5New CodeSee Bill Text
520109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback