IL SB1339 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the month of April of each year is designated as Healthy Pet Month to be observed throughout the State as a month in which all Illinois pet owners are encouraged to take time to review their pet's health needs and make arrangements with their veterinarians to have annual exams and evaluations performed to enhance and extend their pet's quality of life.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTHY PET MONTH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-03-26HouseArrived in House
2019-03-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass State Government; 009-000-000
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
549012New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback