IL SB1339 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0624
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0624
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act. Removes a provision that exempts a person who has a certain type of license from the examination requirement, so long as (1) the license continues to be valid and is renewed before expiration and (2) the person is not newly designated as a qualifying party after July 1, 2003. Effective immediately.
Title
ROOFING LICENSE-EXAMINATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Amendment in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Amendment in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0624 | |
2009-08-24 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-24 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities | |
2009-05-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 26, 2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-22 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-05-22 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-05-22 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-22 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-05-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Demuzio | |
2009-04-02 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-06 | Postponed - Licensed Activities | |
2009-02-27 | Postponed - Licensed Activities | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio |