IL SB1337 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-002-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning taxes on soft drinks imposed by home rule municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTIES-STORMWATER MANAGEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-002-000
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Local Government
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-002-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Senator Steans added as Chief Co-Sponsor.
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-001-001
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6558-11-6bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback