IL SB1337 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides for the hunting and trapping of river otters. Provides that the season limit for river otter shall not exceed 5 river otters per person per season. Provides that possession limits shall be 10 per person per season limit except that this restriction shall not apply to fur buyers, tanners, manufacturers, and taxidermists. Requires that the pelts of river otters shall be tagged in accordance with federal regulations. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources may require harvest registration and set forth procedures, fees for registration, and the process of tagging pelts in administrative rules. Sets fees for registration and tagging shall not exceed $5 per pelt. Effective immediately.
Title
WILDLIFE-RIVER OTTER HUNTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-05-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-04 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2011-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2011 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 2.30b | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 5 | 2.33a | Amended Code | Citation Text |