IL SB1337 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Prohibits a person from tethering or confining any covered animal, on a farm, for all or the majority of any day, in a manner that prevents the animal from (i) lying down, standing up, and fully extending his or her limbs or (ii) turning around freely. Creates exemptions from this requirement for (i) scientific or agricultural research; (ii) examination, testing, individual treatment, or operation for veterinary purposes; (iii) transportation; and (iv) rodeo exhibitions, State or county fair exhibitions, 4-H programs, and similar exhibitions. Provides that any person who violates this requirement is guilty of a Class C misdemeanor and upon conviction must be punished by a fine not to exceed $500, or by imprisonment not to exceed 180 days, or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMALS-FARM ANIMAL CRUELTY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-13 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2009-03-11 To Agriculture and Conservation Subcommittee on Animal Welfare
2009-02-18 Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
2009-02-10 Referred to Assignments
2009-02-10 First Reading
2009-02-10 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback