IL SB1334 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Rights Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning applicability of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIVIL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7657451Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback