IL SB1331 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Changes the Section concerning the declaration of policy to include preventing discrimination based on source of income. Provides that "source of income" means the source of any lawful income or any lawful rent payment that can be verified as to its amount, length of time received, regularity, or receipt, including any subsidy authorized under Section 8 of the United States Housing Act of 1937 and any other local, State, or federal subsidy or benefit. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for an owner or any other person engaging in a real estate transaction, or a real estate broker or salesman, to engage in specified behaviors because of source of income. Provides that specified provisions of the Act do not prohibit persons engaged in the business of furnishing appraisals of real property from taking into consideration factors other than those based on, among other factors, source of income in furnishing appraisals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN RIGHTS-SOURCE OF INCOME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77551-102Amended CodeCitation Text
77551-103Amended CodeCitation Text
77553-102Amended CodeCitation Text
77553-103Amended CodeCitation Text
77553-106Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback