IL SB1329 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes the requirement that a motor carrier of property, in addition to possessing proof of continuous insurance or surety coverage in accordance with Commission regulations, have the proof on file with the Commission or its agents.
Title
VEH CD-PROOF OF INSURANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18c-4901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1329&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1329.htm |