IL SB1327 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
Pending: Senate Appropriations I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that drugs prescribed to residents of the following facilities are not subject to prior approval as a result of the 4-prescription limit: long-term care facilities as defined in the Nursing Home Care Act; community-integrated living arrangements as defined in the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act; and supportive living facilities as defined in the Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-EXCEPTION TO RX LIMIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback