IL SB1327 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the exemption for graphic arts machinery and equipment applies for all periods on and after September 1, 2004. Provides that the exemption includes production related tangible personal property beginning on July 1, 2014. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2014, the manufacturing and assembly exemption also includes production related tangible personal property. Makes changes to the definition of "production related tangible personal property". Provides that the graphic arts exemption and the manufacturing and assembly exemption are each exempt from the Acts' automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC TX-GRAPHIC ARTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Sales Taxes
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351053-30Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-50Amended CodeCitation Text
351102Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-30Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351152Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-30Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-30Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-45Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback