IL SB1326 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning expenses of conducting a primary election.
Title
ELECTIONS-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Sen. Steve McClure [R] |
Sen. Win Stoller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Executive- Elections |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 7-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |