IL SB1325 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Defines "hunting license" as an electronic or physical license authorizing the person to take a certain type of animal during a specified period of time. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-HUNTING LICENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017
2017-03-02SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52051.2k-1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback