IL SB1325 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Defines "hunting license" as an electronic or physical license authorizing the person to take a certain type of animal during a specified period of time. Effective immediately.
Title
WILDLIFE-HUNTING LICENSE
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |