IL SB1320 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Motion Prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Innovations for Transportation Infrastructure Act. Provides that the Department of Transportation may use design-build project delivery methods, Construction Manager/General Contractor project delivery methods, or Alternative Technical Concepts for design-bid-build project delivery of transportation facilities, provided that the delivery method does not exceed 20% of the Department's multi-year highway improvement program, with no one year exceeding 30%. Provides that the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority may use design-build project delivery methods, Construction Manager/General Contractor project delivery methods, or Alternative Technical Concepts for design-bid-build project delivery of transportation facilities if the facilities delivered do not exceed 20% of the Authority's annual improvement program. Places limits on the number of projects that the Department may use the various methods on. Provides that during the first phase of the two-phase procurement, the Transportation Agency (Department of Transportation or the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority) shall not consider price proposals to make its short-list decision. Provides that at least half of the evaluation committee used to assist in selecting design-build and Construction Manager/General Contractor contracts shall consist of licensed design professionals. Provides the Architectural, Engineering, and Land Surveying Qualifications Based Selection Act does not apply to procurements under the new Act. Contains provisions concerning the procurement process and terms of design-build and construction manager-general contractor contracts. Provides that the Transportation Agency has eminent domain and quick take powers under the Act. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code and the Public Construction Bond Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INFRASTRUCTURE DESIGN BUILD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-18HouseArrived in House
2017-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-233New CodeSee Bill Text
203501825-108New CodeSee Bill Text
305001-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text
305501.9New CodeSee Bill Text
305702.8New CodeSee Bill Text
305752.8New CodeSee Bill Text
6051011.2New CodeSee Bill Text
7353015-5-48New CodeSee Bill Text
8201302Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback