IL SB1314 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Elmwood Park Grade Separation Authority Act. Provides that the Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation (currently, the Canadian Pacific Railway Company) shall own and maintain the railway along the grade separation structure. Makes changes concerning the composition of the board. Eliminates provisions requiring the Canadian Pacific Railway to contribute toward certain costs. Defines a required term. Effective immediately.
Title
ELMWOOD PARK GRADE AUTHORITY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1935 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1935 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1935 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1935 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1935 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1935 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |