IL SB1312 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Veterans and Servicemembers Court Treatment Act. Provides that a defendant may be admitted into a Veterans and Servicemembers Court program post-adjudication only with the approval of the court. Provides that a "crime of violence" includes rather than means first degree murder, second degree murder, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual assault, armed robbery, aggravated arson, arson, aggravated kidnapping and kidnapping, aggravated battery resulting in great bodily harm or permanent disability, stalking, aggravated stalking, or any offense involving the discharge of a firearm or where occurred serious bodily injury or death to any person.
Title
VETERANS CT-POST-ADJUDICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0426 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-003-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 167 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |