IL SB1308 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act and the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Provides that, once an agreement is reached between a public or educational employer and its employees regarding all of the terms of a collective bargaining agreement, the agreement shall be reduced to writing and published on the website of the public or educational employer. Requires the public or educational employer, not less than 14 days after publishing such an agreement, to hold an open public meeting on the ratification of that agreement. Provides that any contract between a public employer and an employee where the total compensation exceeds $150,000 shall be published on the employer's website for a period of not less than 14 days prior to being signed by both the employer and the employee. Requires the public employer to hold an open public meeting on the contract in addition to posting it for 14 days if that contract is subject to board approval. Makes conforming changes in the Open Meetings Act and the Freedom of Information Act. Effective immediately.
Title
LABOR AGREEMENT HEARINGS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Labor |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |