IL SB1302 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the prohibition by a licensee under the Act from carrying a firearm into any building, parking area, or portion of a building under the control of an officer of the executive or legislative branch of government does not apply to any rest areas under the control of the Department of Transportation or to buildings located in rest areas under the control of the Department of Transportation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-DOT REST AREAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306665Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback