IL SB1301 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a non-resident may carry a handgun under the Act if the non-resident is 21 years of age or older, has a license or permit in a state where the training requirements are substantially similar under the Act or to non-residents of contiguous states if a reciprocal agreement has been entered into, the permit holder is not a resident of Illinois, and the permit holder is a legal resident of the United States. Provides that a non-resident is subject to the same laws and restrictions as a license holder under the Act. Provides that if a resident of another state who is permitted to carry under this provision establishes legal residence in this State, the license or permit shall be valid in this State for 90 days following the date on which the holder of the license establishes legal residence in this State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-RECIPROCITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-24SenateRe-assigned to Judiciary
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306642New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback