IL SB1300 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that full-time, sworn, compensated fire fighters are permitted to carry a pistol, revolver, stun gun, taser, or other firearm on his or her person in public or in a vehicle, if the fire fighter has a valid concealed carry license, is carrying on duty, and has been approved to carry on duty by the mayor, city council, village president, or village board of trustees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM-FIREFIGHTERS EXCEPTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-24SenateRe-assigned to Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback