IL SB1291 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Lethal Violence Order of Protection Act. Provides that a petitioner may request an emergency lethal violence order of protection by filing an affidavit or verified pleading alleging that the respondent poses an immediate and present danger of causing personal injury to himself, herself, or another by having in his or her custody or control, owning, purchasing, possessing, or receiving a firearm. Provides that the petition shall also describe the type, and location of any firearm or firearms presently believed by the petitioner to be possessed or controlled by the respondent. Provides that the petitioner may be a family member of the respondent or a law enforcement officer, who files a petition alleging that the respondent poses a danger of causing personal injury to himself, herself, or another by having in his or her custody or control, owning, purchasing, possessing, or receiving a firearm. Establishes factors that the court must consider before issuing a lethal violence order of protection. Provides for the issuance of ex parte orders and one year orders. Provides that if the court issues the order the respondent must: (1) refrain from having in his or her custody or control, owning, purchasing, possessing, or receiving additional firearms for the duration of the order; and (2) turn over to the local law enforcement agency any firearm, Firearm Owner's Identification Card, or concealed carry license in his or her possession. Establishes factors for renewing and terminating lethal violence orders of protection. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act and the Firearm Concealed Carry Act to make conforming changes. Defines "family member of the respondent", "lethal violence order of protection", "petitioner", and "respondent".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LETHAL ORDER OF PROTECTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-02-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430658.2Amended CodeCitation Text
4306670Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback