IL SB1290 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. In a Section concerning the debt limitations of school districts, provides that, in addition to all other authority to issue bonds, Waltham Community Consolidated School District 185 may incur indebtedness in an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $9,500,000 to build and equip a new school building and improve the site thereof if certain conditions are met, including (1) that the voters of the district approve an advisory question that recommends the building and equipping of a new school building at the general election held on November 8, 2016 and (2) that, prior to incurring the debt, the school board determines, by resolution, that the building and equipping of a new school building is required as a result of the age and condition of the district's existing buildings. Provides that the debt issued and any bonds issued to pay, refund, or continue to refund such debt must mature within not to exceed 25 years from their date, notwithstanding any other law to the contrary. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DEBT LIMIT EXCEPTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-004-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-004-000
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rezin
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Education; 009-003-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105519-1Amended CodeCitation Text
105519-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback